US SR127 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2062; text: CR S2057)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2062; text: CR S2057)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution encourages (1) the people of the United States to join in a national effort to salute AmeriCorps members and alumni and to raise awareness about the importance of national and community service, and (2) all individuals to consider opportunities to serve in AmeriCorps. This resolution also acknowledges the accomplishments of AmeriCorps members, alumni, and community partners, and recognizes its important contributions to the lives of the people of the United States.
Title
A resolution recognizing the contributions of AmeriCorps members and alumni to the lives of the people of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2062; text: CR S2057) |
Same As/Similar To
HR227 (Same As) 2019-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR899 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR540 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1707; text: CR S1706)
HR899 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR540 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1707; text: CR S1706)
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Labor and employment
National and community service
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Labor and employment
National and community service
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/127/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres127/BILLS-116sres127ats.pdf |