US SR135 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-16)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3199-3200; text: CR S3199-3200)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3199-3200; text: CR S3199-3200)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the 75th anniversary of the amphibious landing of the allied forces on D-Day, June 6, 1944, at Normandy, France, during World War II. The resolution expresses appreciation to the members of the U.S. Armed Forces who participated in the operations, thanks the young people of Normandy and the United States for their involvement in events celebrating the anniversary of the Normandy landings, recognizes the efforts of France and the people of Normandy to preserve the world heritage represented by the Normandy beaches and the sunken material remains of the landings by inscribing these on the UNESCO World Heritage List, and requests the President to issue a proclamation calling on the people of the United States to observe the 75th anniversary.
Title
A resolution expressing the gratitude and appreciation of the Senate for the acts of heroism and valor by the members of the United States Armed Forces who participated in the June 6, 1944, amphibious landing at Normandy, France, and commending those individuals for leadership and bravery in an operation that helped bring an end to World War II.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3199-3200; text: CR S3199-3200) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 98. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2193) |
Subjects
Alliances
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Europe
France
Historic sites and heritage areas
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
World history
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Europe
France
Historic sites and heritage areas
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
World history