US SR150 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8154)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8154)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing threats to freedom of the press and expression around the world and reaffirming freedom of the press as a priority in efforts of the United States Government to promote democracy and good governance. Welcomes the celebration of World Press Freedom Day 2017 on May 3, 2017. Commends journalists and media workers around the world for their role in promoting government accountability, defending democratic activity, and strengthening civil society, despite threats to their safety. Pays tribute to journalists who have lost their lives or liberty carrying out their work. Calls on governments abroad to implement United Nations General Assembly Resolution 163 (1963) by investigating and seeking to resolve cases of violence against journalists and by reporting on the investigations. Expresses concern about the threats to freedom of the press and expression around the world and condemns actions that suppress it. Calls on the President and the Department of State to: build upon U.S. leadership in freedom of the press; improve the means by which the U.S. government identifies, publicizes, and responds to threats against freedom of the press around the world; urge foreign governments to conduct transparent investigations and adjudications of the perpetrators of attacks against journalists; and highlight the issue of threats against freedom of the press in the annual Human Rights Reports and year round.
Title
A resolution recognizing threats to freedom of the press and expression around the world and reaffirming freedom of the press as a priority in efforts of the United States Government to promote democracy and good governance.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-20 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8154) |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 277. |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2725) |
Same As/Similar To
SR501 (Related) 2018-11-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7194)
HR875 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HR875 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Congressional tributes
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Evidence and witnesses
First Amendment rights
Human rights
International affairs
News media and reporting
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
United Nations
Violent crime
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Congressional tributes
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Evidence and witnesses
First Amendment rights
Human rights
International affairs
News media and reporting
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
United Nations
Violent crime