US SR150 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6-1)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 4/9/2019 CR S2333)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 4/9/2019 CR S2333)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution states that it is U.S. policy to (1) commemorate the Armenian Genocide, the killing of 1.5 million Armenians by the Ottoman Empire from 1915 to 1923; (2) reject efforts to associate the U.S. government with efforts to deny the existence of the Armenian Genocide or any genocide; and (3) encourage education and public understanding about the Armenian Genocide.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that it is the policy of the United States to commemorate the Armenian Genocide through official recognition and remembrance.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 4/9/2019 CR S2333) |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7010) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HR296 (Same As) 2019-10-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR655 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR655 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armenia
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Europe
Human rights
International affairs
Racial and ethnic relations
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
World history
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Europe
Human rights
International affairs
Racial and ethnic relations
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
World history