US SR16 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S146; text: CR S145-146)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S146; text: CR S145-146)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution declares that (1) the Senate has heard with profound sorrow and deep regret the announcement of the death of the Honorable John Chester Culver, former Member of the Senate; and (2) when the Senate adjourns on January 10, 2019, it stand adjourned as a further mark of respect to the memory of the Honorable John Chester Culver.
Title
A resolution relative to the death of John Chester Culver, former United States Senator for the State of Iowa.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S146; text: CR S145-146) |
Same As/Similar To
HR6 (Related) 2019-01-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR14 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Committee on Rules, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HR14 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Committee on Rules, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/16/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres16/BILLS-116sres16ats.pdf |