US SR162 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 4/11/2019 S2441)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 4/11/2019 S2441)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of April 2019 as National Donate Life Month and for promoting awareness of organ and tissue donation.
Title
A resolution supporting the designation of April 2019 as "National Donate Life Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 4/11/2019 S2441) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2655) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HR315 (Related) 2019-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Health
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Congressional tributes
Health
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation