US SR167 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2455; text: CR S2443)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2455; text: CR S2443)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates April 20-April 28, 2019, as National Park Week. The resolution also encourages the people of the United States and the world to visit U.S. national parks.
Title
A resolution designating the week of April 20, 2019, through April 28, 2019, as "National Park Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2455; text: CR S2443) |
Same As/Similar To
SR574 (Related) 2020-05-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2430; text: CR S2424-2425)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Travel and tourism
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Travel and tourism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/167/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres167/BILLS-116sres167ats.pdf |