US SR183 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6255-6256)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6255-6256)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution reaffirms the longstanding U.S. policy to pursue close and cooperative ties with Japan and the vital role of the U.S.-Japan alliance in promoting peace and stability. It also calls for further strengthening ties between the two countries.
Title
A resolution reaffirming the vital role of the United States-Japan alliance in promoting peace, stability, and prosperity in the Indo-Pacific region and beyond, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6255-6256) |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 233. |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2619-2620) |
Same As/Similar To
HR349 (Related) 2020-11-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Alliances
Asia
Cultural exchanges and relations
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Japan
Asia
Cultural exchanges and relations
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Japan