US SR184 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3296-3297; text: CR S3296-3297)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution condemning the Easter Sunday terrorist attacks in Sri Lanka, offering sincere condolences to the victims, to their families and friends, and to the people and nation of Sri Lanka, and expressing solidarity and support for Sri Lanka.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution condemning the Easter Sunday terrorist attacks in Sri Lanka, offering sincere condolences to the victims, to their families and friends, and to the people and nation of Sri Lanka, and expressing solidarity and support for Sri Lanka.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3296-3297; text: CR S3296-3297)
2019-06-03SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 105.
2019-06-03SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
2019-05-22SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
2019-05-02SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2620)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback