US SR197 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-10-2)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2748-2749; text: CR S2748)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2748-2749; text: CR S2748)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution thanks the teachers of the United States and promotes the teaching profession by encouraging students, parents, school administrators, and public officials to participate in National Teacher Appreciation Week.
Title
A resolution recognizing the roles and contributions of the teachers of the United States in building and enhancing the civic, cultural, and economic well-being of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] |
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2748-2749; text: CR S2748) |
Same As/Similar To
HR363 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR959 (Related) 2020-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR568 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2347; text: CR S2343)
HR959 (Related) 2020-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR568 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2347; text: CR S2343)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/197/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres197/BILLS-116sres197ats.pdf |