US SR20 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-25 - Referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S243-244)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-25 - Referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S243-244)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes that the implementation of the United States-Korea Free Trade Agreement, the United States-Colombia Trade Promotion Agreement, and the United States-Panama Trade Promotion Agreement will create jobs in the United States, increase export opportunities for U.S. businesses and agricultural producers, and further develop cross-cultural business relationships between the United States and South Korea, Colombia, and Panama. Expresses the sense of the Senate that it is in the security, economic, and diplomatic interests of the United States to enhance relationships with such countries by immediately approving such trade agreements.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the United States should immediately approve the United States-Korea Free Trade Agreement, the United States-Colombia Trade Promotion Agreement, and the United States-Panama Trade Promotion Agreement.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Saxby Chambliss [R-GA] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Kay Hutchison [R-TX] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
Sen. Richard Lugar [R-IN] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S243-244) |
Same As/Similar To
HR86 (Related) 2011-02-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HR266 (Related) 2011-05-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HR251 (Related) 2011-05-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HR266 (Related) 2011-05-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HR251 (Related) 2011-05-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Agricultural trade
Asia
Colombia
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Foreign trade and international finance
Free trade and trade barriers
Latin America
Panama
South Korea
Trade agreements and negotiations
Asia
Colombia
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Foreign trade and international finance
Free trade and trade barriers
Latin America
Panama
South Korea
Trade agreements and negotiations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-resolution/20/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/sres20/BILLS-112sres20is.pdf |