US SR202 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2793; text: CR S2792)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2793; text: CR S2792)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution congratulates the students, families, teachers, administrators, and staff of public charter schools across the United States for (1) making ongoing contributions to public education, (2) making impressive strides in closing the academic achievement gap in U.S. schools, and (3) improving and strengthening the public school system. The resolution supports the ideals and goals of the 20th annual National Charter Schools Week.
Title
A resolution congratulating the students, parents, teachers, and leaders of charter schools across the United States for making ongoing contributions to education, and supporting the ideals and goals of the 20th annual National Charter Schools Week, to be held on May 12 through May 18, 2019.
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2793; text: CR S2792) |
Same As/Similar To
SR571 (Related) 2020-05-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 05/12/2020 CR S2382-2383)
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/202/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres202/BILLS-116sres202ats.pdf |