US SR218 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3063-3064)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3063-3064)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the significance of Asian/Pacific American Heritage Month as an important time to celebrate the contributions of Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders to the history of the United States. The resolution also recognizes that the Asian American and Pacific Islander communities enhance the rich diversity of the United States.
Title
A resolution recognizing the significance of Asian/Pacific American Heritage Month as an important time to celebrate the significant contributions of Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders to the history of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3063-3064) |
Same As/Similar To
HR401 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR589 (Same As) 2020-05-20 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2445-2555)
HR983 (Same As) 2020-05-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR589 (Same As) 2020-05-20 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2445-2555)
HR983 (Same As) 2020-05-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
Arts, culture, religion
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/218/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres218/BILLS-116sres218is.pdf |