US SR220 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates June 2019 as National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Month and June 27, 2019, as National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Day. The resolution supports (1) the education of members of the Armed Forces, veterans, their families, and the public about post-traumatic stress; and (2) efforts by the Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Defense to foster cultural change around the issue of post-traumatic stress. The resolution also encourages officers of the Armed Forces to support treatment of members of the Armed Forces who suffer from post-traumatic stress.
Title
A resolution designating the month of June 2019 as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Month" and June 27, 2019, as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4665) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3114) |
Same As/Similar To
HR455 (Related) 2019-07-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR618 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/15/2020 CR S2975-2976)
HR1006 (Related) 2020-06-15 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SR618 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/15/2020 CR S2975-2976)
HR1006 (Related) 2020-06-15 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Department of Veterans Affairs
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care
Commemorative events and holidays
Department of Veterans Affairs
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care