US SR224 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3127; text: CR S3117)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3127; text: CR S3117)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Nurses Week. It also recognizes the contributions of nurses to the U.S. health care system.
Title
A resolution supporting the goals and ideals of National Nurses Week, to be observed from May 6 through May 12, 2019.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3127; text: CR S3117) |
Same As/Similar To
HR368 (Related) 2019-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR951 (Same As) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR561 (Same As) 2020-05-06 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2294)
HR951 (Same As) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR561 (Same As) 2020-05-06 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2294)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/224/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres224/BILLS-116sres224ats.pdf |