US SR226 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3127; text: CR S3118)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3127; text: CR S3118)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of National Foster Care Month and for the designation of May 31, 2019, as National Foster Parent Appreciation Day.
Title
A resolution recognizing National Foster Care Month as an opportunity to raise awareness about the challenges of children in the foster care system, and encouraging Congress to implement policy to improve the lives of children in the foster care system.
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3127; text: CR S3118) |
Same As/Similar To
HR340 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HR966 (Related) 2020-05-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SR598 (Related) 2020-05-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2610; text: CR S2607-2608)
HR966 (Related) 2020-05-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SR598 (Related) 2020-05-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2610; text: CR S2607-2608)
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Families
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Families
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/226/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres226/BILLS-116sres226ats.pdf |