US SR23 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2456-2458; text: CR S2457-2458)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2456-2458; text: CR S2457-2458)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the Senate's observation of Countering International Parental Child Abduction Month in April 2019. It also urges the United States to lead in raising awareness about the devastating impact of international child abduction.
Title
A resolution supporting the goals and ideals of Countering International Parental Child Abduction Month and expressing the sense of the Senate that Congress should raise awareness of the harm caused by international parental child abduction.
Sponsors
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2456-2458; text: CR S2457-2458) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 56. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SR487 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S643-644)
Subjects
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Commemorative events and holidays
Family relationships
International affairs
International law and treaties
Mental health
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Child safety and welfare
Commemorative events and holidays
Family relationships
International affairs
International law and treaties
Mental health
Separation, divorce, custody, support