US SR236 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6256; text: 6/5/2019 CR S3264)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6256; text: 6/5/2019 CR S3264)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution commends the people of Tunisia for their commitment to democracy, the rule of law, and free elections, and encourages Tunisia's political leaders to work together to accelerate economic reforms and anti-corruption measures. It also calls on the government to fully implement the Tunisian Constitution of 2014, which includes protections for civil liberties and the establishment of the Constitutional Court.
Title
A resolution reaffirming the strong partnership between Tunisia and the United States and supporting the people of Tunisia in their continued pursuit of democratic reforms.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6256; text: 6/5/2019 CR S3264) |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 234. |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HR458 (Related) 2020-03-04 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Subjects
Africa
Area studies and international education
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional tributes
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Crime victims
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Higher education
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
News media and reporting
Rule of law and government transparency
Smuggling and trafficking
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
Tunisia
Area studies and international education
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional tributes
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Crime victims
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Higher education
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
News media and reporting
Rule of law and government transparency
Smuggling and trafficking
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
Tunisia