US SR245 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3327-3328; text: CR S3325)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3327-3328; text: CR S3325)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates July 17, 2019, as Glioblastoma Awareness Day.
Title
A resolution designating July 17, 2019, as "Glioblastoma Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3327-3328; text: CR S3325) |
Same As/Similar To
HR1004 (Related) 2020-06-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR617 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 06/15/2020 S2975)
SR617 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 06/15/2020 S2975)
Subjects
Cancer
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Neurological disorders
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Neurological disorders
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/245/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres245/BILLS-116sres245ats.pdf |