US SR263 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-31 - Star Print ordered on the resolution.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-31 - Star Print ordered on the resolution.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the legacy of The American Legion in honor of its 100th anniversary.
Title
A resolution honoring the 100th anniversary of The American Legion.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | Senate | Star Print ordered on the resolution. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 6/25/2019 S4510) |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5217) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR539 (Related) 2019-08-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Veterans' organizations and recognition