US SR265 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 6/26/2019 S4579)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 6/26/2019 S4579)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates July 27, 2019, as National Day of the American Cowboy.
Title
A resolution designating July 27, 2019, as "National Day of the American Cowboy".
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 6/26/2019 S4579) |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5018) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SR654 (Related) 2020-07-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4359; text: CR S4356)
Subjects
Arts, culture, religion
Commemorative events and holidays
Migrant, seasonal, agricultural labor
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Migrant, seasonal, agricultural labor
U.S. history