US SR27 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-26)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 57.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution calling for a prompt multinational freedom of navigation operation in the Black Sea and urging the cancellation of the Nord Stream 2 pipeline. This resolution urges the President to work with allies to lead a multinational freedom of navigation operation in the Black Sea to push back against excessive Russian claims of sovereignty. It also calls for the North Atlantic Treaty Organization to enhance allied maritime presence and capabilities in the Black Sea and for European governments to cancel the Nord Stream 2 pipeline due to its threat to European energy security. The resolution also urges the President to provide additional security assistance to Ukraine and states that the President is required by statute to impose mandatory sanctions on Russia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution calling for a prompt multinational freedom of navigation operation in the Black Sea and urging the cancellation of the Nord Stream 2 pipeline.

Sponsors

Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI]Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL]Sen. James Risch [R-ID]Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ]
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK]Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI]Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH]Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY]
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT]Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI]Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT]
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO]Sen. John Boozman [R-AR]Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN]Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD]
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE]Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA]Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME]Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE]
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX]Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR]Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND]Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID]
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX]Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT]Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL]Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY]
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE]Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO]Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC]Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA]
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH]Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI]Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND]Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS]
Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL]Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA]Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA]Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN]
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK]Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR]Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS]Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI]
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH]Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS]Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT]Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD]
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL]Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE]Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI]Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN]
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI]Sen. John Thune [R-SD]Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC]Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA]
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD]Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI]Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS]Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR]
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN]Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV]Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV]Sen. David Perdue [R-GA]
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA]Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK]Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 57.
2019-04-04SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
2019-04-03SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S590-591)

Same As/Similar To

HR116 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback