US SR277 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6256; text: 7/17/2019 CR S4912-4913)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6256; text: 7/17/2019 CR S4912-4913)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution reiterates the Senate's condemnation of the 1994 attack on the Argentine Israelite Mutual Association (AMIA) Jewish Community Center in Buenos Aires and honors the victims of the attack. It commends efforts by various Argentinian government officials in investigating the matter but also expresses concern about the continuing 25-year delay in resolving the case.
Title
A resolution remembering the 25th Anniversary of the bombing of the Argentine Israelite Mutual Association (AMIA) Jewish Community Center in Buenos Aires, Argentina, and recommitting to efforts to uphold justice for the 85 victims of the attack.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6256; text: 7/17/2019 CR S4912-4913) |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 235. |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-07-17 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Subjects
Agricultural trade
Argentina
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Grain
International affairs
Iran
Latin America
Middle East
Oil and gas
Religion
Terrorism
Argentina
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Grain
International affairs
Iran
Latin America
Middle East
Oil and gas
Religion
Terrorism