US SR297 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 367.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 367.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution commends the Inter-American Foundation (IAF) on its 50th anniversary for significant contributions to strengthening democracy, peace, and economic and social development in Latin America and the Caribbean, and it expresses the Senate's committment to continue supporting the work of the IAF.
Title
A resolution commending the Inter-American Foundation (IAF) on the occasion of its 50th anniversary for its significant accomplishments and contributions to the economic and social development of the Americas.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 367. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S5257) |
Same As/Similar To
HR649 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Subjects
Caribbean area
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Foreign aid and international relief
Inter-American Foundation
International affairs
Latin America
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Foreign aid and international relief
Inter-American Foundation
International affairs
Latin America
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status