US SR309 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-12 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5476-5477)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-12 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5476-5477)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates September 2019 as National Voting Rights Month, encourages people to uphold the right to vote, encourages Congress to pass certain voting rights legislation, recommends the development of a curriculum in public schools and universities regarding voting, encourages the U.S. Postal Service to issue a special Fannie Lou Hamer stamp during the month of September, and invites Congress to allocate funds for public service announcements regarding elections.
Title
A resolution designating September 2019 as "National Voting Rights Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-12 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5476-5477) |
Same As/Similar To
HR556 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HR1114 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
SR695 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5614-5615)
HR1114 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
SR695 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5614-5615)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Higher education
Marketing and advertising
Postal service
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
State and local government operations
Teaching, teachers, curricula
U.S. history
Voting rights
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Higher education
Marketing and advertising
Postal service
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
State and local government operations
Teaching, teachers, curricula
U.S. history
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/309/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres309/BILLS-116sres309is.pdf |