US SR322 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 09/23/2019 CR S5631)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 09/23/2019 CR S5631)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of Rail Safety Week.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of the week of September 22 through September 28, 2019, as Rail Safety Week in the United States, and supporting the goals and ideals of Rail Safety Week to reduce rail-related accidents, fatalities, and injuries.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-15 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 09/23/2019 CR S5631) |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5799) |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HR609 (Related) 2019-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HR1106 (Same As) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SR768 (Related) 2020-11-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6679; text: CR S6676-6677)
HR1106 (Same As) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SR768 (Related) 2020-11-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6679; text: CR S6676-6677)
Subjects
Accidents
Commemorative events and holidays
Railroads
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Commemorative events and holidays
Railroads
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security