US SR324 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 9/24/2019 CR S5666)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 9/24/2019 CR S5666)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates September 29, 2019, as National Urban Wildlife Refuge Day.
Title
A resolution designating September 29, 2019, as "National Urban Wildlife Refuge Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-16 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 9/24/2019 CR S5666) |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5853) |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1123 (Related) 2020-09-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SR735 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5998; text: CR S5985)
SR735 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5998; text: CR S5985)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats