US SR338 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5710)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5710)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution (1) designates Malnutrition Awareness Week, (2) recognizes the work of nutrition professionals and others in advancing awareness and prevention of malnutrition, and (3) recognizes the importance of federal nutrition programs in preventing and treating malnutrition and the need to reauthorize certain programs to provide nutrition assistance to vulnerable populations.
Title
A resolution designating the week of September 23 through September 27, 2019, as "Malnutrition Awareness Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S5710) |
Same As/Similar To
SR716 (Related) 2020-11-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR 09/24/2020 S5875-5876)
Subjects
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Food assistance and relief
Health
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Nutrition and diet
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Women's health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Food assistance and relief
Health
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Nutrition and diet
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/338/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres338/BILLS-116sres338is.pdf |