US SR343 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S76; text: CR 9/26/2019 S5752)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S76; text: CR 9/26/2019 S5752)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the Czech Republic and the Slovak Republic for their achievements in building prosperous, democratic societies since the dissolution of Czechoslovakia. The resolution also commends the countries for their support of NATO (North Atlantic Treaty Organization) operations in Afghanistan and reaffirms the United States' commitment to a free and peaceful Europe.
Title
A resolution congratulating the people of the Czech Republic and the people of the Slovak Republic on the 30th anniversary of the Velvet Revolution, the 26th anniversary of the formation of the Czech Republic and the Slovak Republic, and the 101st anniversary of the declaration of independence of Czechoslovakia.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S76; text: CR 9/26/2019 S5752) |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 337. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HR618 (Related) 2019-10-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment.
Subjects
Afghanistan
Alliances
Asia
Collective security
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Czech Republic
Europe
International affairs
Military operations and strategy
Slovakia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Alliances
Asia
Collective security
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Czech Republic
Europe
International affairs
Military operations and strategy
Slovakia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status