US SR348 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5754)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5754)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution proclaims the week of September 23-September 27, 2019, as National Clean Energy Week.
Title
A resolution proclaiming the week of September 23 through September 27, 2019, as "National Clean Energy Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5754) |
Same As/Similar To
HR565 (Related) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1130 (Related) 2020-09-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR705 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5715-5716; text: CR S5712)
HR1130 (Related) 2020-09-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR705 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5715-5716; text: CR S5712)
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Energy
Small business
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Energy
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/348/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres348/BILLS-116sres348ats.pdf |