US SR349 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5754-5755)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5754-5755)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution supporting the designation of September 20, 2019, as "National Concussion Awareness Day".
Title
A resolution supporting the designation of September 20, 2019, as "National Concussion Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5754-5755) |
Same As/Similar To
HR567 (Related) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1127 (Related) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR708 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S5713)
HR1127 (Related) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR708 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S5713)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Neurological disorders
Congressional tributes
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Neurological disorders
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/349/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres349/BILLS-116sres349ats.pdf |