US SR37 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S815; text: CR S811)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S815; text: CR S811)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates the week beginning on February 3, 2019, as National Tribal Colleges and Universities Week.
Title
A resolution designating the week beginning February 3, 2019, as "National Tribal Colleges and Universities Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S815; text: CR S811) |
Same As/Similar To
HR104 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR824 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR491 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 02/05/2020 CR S943-944)
HR824 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR491 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 02/05/2020 CR S943-944)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Minority education
Native Americans
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Minority education
Native Americans
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/37/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres37/BILLS-116sres37ats.pdf |