US SR371 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S251-252)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S251-252)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses the Senate's support for a sustainable peace and democracy in South Sudan. Further, it calls on the United States and other countries to take certain steps to implement the 2018 revitalized peace agreement, monitor human rights abuses and corruption, and support the renewal of an arms embargo in South Sudan.
Title
A resolution reaffirming the support of the United States for the people of the Republic of South Sudan and calling on all parties to uphold their commitments to peace and dialogue as outlined in the 2018 revitalized peace agreement.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S251-252) |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 338. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S5975-5976) |
Subjects
Africa
Arms control and nonproliferation
Child safety and welfare
Conflicts and wars
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign aid and international relief
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military personnel and dependents
Militias and paramilitary groups
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sanctions
South Sudan
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Trade restrictions
United Nations
Arms control and nonproliferation
Child safety and welfare
Conflicts and wars
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign aid and international relief
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military personnel and dependents
Militias and paramilitary groups
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sanctions
South Sudan
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Trade restrictions
United Nations