US SR377 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/24/2019 CR S6160)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/24/2019 CR S6160)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates October 30, 2019, as a national day of remembrance for workers of the nuclear weapons program, including uranium workers.
Title
A resolution designating October 30, 2019, as a national day of remembrance for the workers of the nuclear weapons program of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/24/2019 CR S6160) |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6307) |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SR741 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5998; text: CR S5987)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Mining
Nuclear weapons
Worker safety and health
Commemorative events and holidays
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Mining
Nuclear weapons
Worker safety and health