US SR393 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 10/31/2019 S6339)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 10/31/2019 S6339)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the contributions and sacrifices made by Sikhs of the United States and expresses respect for all Sikhs who practice their faith. The resolution also recognizes the historical, cultural, and religious significance of Guru Nanak's 550th birthday. Additionally, the resolution recognizes the discrimination Sikhs of the United States have faced.
Title
A resolution recognizing the historical, cultural, and religious significance of the 550th birthday of Guru Nanak and the contributions and sacrifices made by Sikhs of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 10/31/2019 S6339) |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6614) |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR538 (Related) 2019-08-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR680 (Related) 2019-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR689 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR427 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6612-6613)
HR680 (Related) 2019-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR689 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR427 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6612-6613)
Subjects
Asia
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion