US SR408 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1607; text as passed Senate: CR S1602)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1607; text as passed Senate: CR S1602)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating April 2016 as "National Congenital Diaphragmatic Hernia Awareness Month". Designates April 2016 as National Congenital Diaphragmatic Hernia Awareness Month. (Congenital diaphragmatic hernia is a birth defect that occurs when the diaphragm fails to fully form, allowing abdominal organs to migrate into the chest cavity and preventing lung growth.) Encourages that steps should be taken to: raise awareness of and increase public knowledge about congenital diaphragmatic hernia (CDH); inform all Americans about the dangers of CDH; disseminate information on the importance of quality neonatal care for CDH patients; promote quality prenatal care and the use of ultrasounds to detect CDH in utero; and support research funding of CDH to improve screening and treatment, discover its causes, and develop a cure.
Title
A resolution designating April 2016 as "National Congenital Diaphragmatic Hernia Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Sessions [R-AL] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1607; text as passed Senate: CR S1602) |
Same As/Similar To
HR224 (Related) 2015-05-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR115 (Related) 2015-03-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1957; text as passed Senate: CR S1895)
HR715 (Related) 2016-05-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR115 (Related) 2015-03-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1957; text as passed Senate: CR S1895)
HR715 (Related) 2016-05-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Birth defects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Research administration and funding
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Research administration and funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-resolution/408/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/sres408/BILLS-114sres408ats.pdf |