US SR414 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-11-1)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6485-6486; text: CR S6481-6482)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6485-6486; text: CR S6481-6482)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes November 2019 as National Native American Heritage Month and the Friday after Thanksgiving as Native American Heritage Day.
Title
A resolution recognizing National Native American Heritage Month and celebrating the heritages and cultures of Native Americans and the contributions of Native Americans to the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-07 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6485-6486; text: CR S6481-6482) |
Same As/Similar To
HR682 (Related) 2019-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR779 (Related) 2020-11-18 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7083; text: CR S7080)
HR1228 (Related) 2020-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR779 (Related) 2020-11-18 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7083; text: CR S7080)
HR1228 (Related) 2020-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/414/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres414/BILLS-116sres414ats.pdf |