US SR427 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6612-6613)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6612-6613)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the contributions and sacrifices made by Sikh Americans and expresses respect for all Sikhs who practice their faith. The resolution also recognizes the historical, cultural, and religious significance of Guru Nanak's 550th birthday and the inspiring nature of Guru Nanak's teachings on equality and service. Additionally, the resolution recognizes the discrimination Sikh Americans have faced.
Title
A resolution recognizing the historical, cultural, and religious significance of Sikh Americans, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6612-6613) |
Same As/Similar To
HR538 (Related) 2019-08-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR680 (Related) 2019-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR689 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR393 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 10/31/2019 S6339)
HR680 (Related) 2019-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR689 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR393 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 10/31/2019 S6339)
Subjects
Asia
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/427/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres427/BILLS-116sres427is.pdf |