US SR438 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6764; text: CR S6760)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6764; text: CR S6760)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for National Adoption Month and National Adoption Day and encourages people to consider adoption to increase the number of children living in safe, permanent homes.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the goals of National Adoption Month and National Adoption Day by promoting national awareness of adoption and the children waiting for adoption, celebrating children and families involved in adoption, and encouraging the people of the United States to secure safety, permanency, and well-being for all children.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6764; text: CR S6760) |
Same As/Similar To
HR704 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR1220 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR787 (Same As) 2020-12-02 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7189; text: CR S7182)
HR1220 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR787 (Same As) 2020-12-02 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7189; text: CR S7182)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/438/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres438/BILLS-116sres438ats.pdf |