US SR450 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 12/10/2019 CR S6954)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 12/10/2019 CR S6954)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates December 10, 2019, as Human Rights Day. It also reaffirms the Universal Declaration of Human Rights and supports the rights of human rights defenders all over the world to promote fundamental freedoms enshrined in the declaration.
Title
A resolution recognizing the 71st anniversary of the Universal Declaration of Human Rights and the celebration of "Human Rights Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 12/10/2019 CR S6954) |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7165) |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1259 (Related) 2020-12-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Human rights
International affairs
International law and treaties
Political movements and philosophies
Rule of law and government transparency
Human rights
International affairs
International law and treaties
Political movements and philosophies
Rule of law and government transparency