US SR454 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2921-2922; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2922)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2921-2922; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2922)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution condemns the conviction, sentencing, and imprisonment of Cuban democracy and human rights activist Jose Daniel Ferrer and calls for the release of Ferrer and all members of the Patriotic Union of Cuba (UNPACU). The resolution further commends Ferrer and recognizes the contributions of UNPACU for advancing human rights and fundamental freedoms in Cuba.
Title
A resolution calling for the immediate release of Cuban democracy activist Jose Daniel Ferrer and commending the efforts of Jose Daniel Ferrer to promote human rights and fundamental freedoms in Cuba.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2921-2922; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2922) |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 467. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S7031-7032) |
Same As/Similar To
HR774 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Caribbean area
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Cuba
Detention of persons
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Political movements and philosophies
Protest and dissent
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Cuba
Detention of persons
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Political movements and philosophies
Protest and dissent
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status