US SR491 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 02/05/2020 CR S943-944)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 02/05/2020 CR S943-944)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates the week beginning on February 2, 2020, as National Tribal Colleges and Universities Week.
Title
A resolution designating the week beginning February 2, 2020, as "National Tribal Colleges and University Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 02/05/2020 CR S943-944) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S997) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR824 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR104 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR37 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S815; text: CR S811)
HR104 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR37 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S815; text: CR S811)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Minority education
Native Americans
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Minority education
Native Americans