US SR50 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. Res. 50 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 57) entered in Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. Res. 50 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 57) entered in Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution limits Senate post-cloture consideration to two hours for certain nominations. This limitation applies to a nomination to U.S. district courts, to the U.S. Court of Federal Claims, or to an executive branch position that is not at level I of the Executive Schedule; or as a member of the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, the Securities and Exchange Commission, the Federal Election Commission, the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, the Federal Trade Commission, the National Labor Relations Board, the Commodity Futures Trading Commission, the Consumer Product Safety Commission, the Federal Communications Commission, the Surface Transportation Board, the Nuclear Regulatory Commission, the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, or the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System. Senate post-cloture consideration of all nominations shall be equally divided between the majority and the minority leaders.
Title
A resolution improving procedures for the consideration of nominations in the Senate.
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. Res. 50 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 57) entered in Senate. RC# 57 (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure RC# 57 (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure RC# 57 (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. Res. 50 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 57) entered in Senate. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 48. Record Vote Number: 57. (CR S2177) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S2163) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed presented in Senate. (CR S2082) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S2082) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 24. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee on Rules and Administration. Reported by Senator Blunt without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee on Rules and Administration. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S924) |