US SR502 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-31 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 8/1/2014 S5313--5314; text as passed Senate: CR 8/1/2014 S5313-5313)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-31 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 8/1/2014 S5313--5314; text as passed Senate: CR 8/1/2014 S5313-5313)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Affirms that all children deserve a safe, loving, and permanent family. Recognizes the importance of ensuring that international adoptions of all children are conducted in an ethical and transparent manner. Expresses concern over the impact on children and families caused by the current suspension of exit permit issuance within the Democratic Republic of the Congo. Requests that such government: (1) resume processing adoption cases and issuing exit permits via the Ministry of Gender and Family's Interministerial Adoption Committee and Directorate of General Migration; (2) prioritize the processing of intercountry adoptions which were initiated before the suspension, and (3) expedite the processing of adoptions involving medically fragile children. Encourages continued dialogue and cooperation between the Department of State and the Democratic Republic of the Congo's Ministry of Foreign Affairs to improve the intercountry adoption process and ensure the welfare of all children adopted from the Democratic Republic of the Congo.
Title
A resolution concerning the suspension of exit permit issuance by the Government of the Democratic Republic of Congo for adopted Congolese children seeking to depart the country with their adoptive parents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 8/1/2014 S5313--5314; text as passed Senate: CR 8/1/2014 S5313-5313) |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 495. |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4509-4510) |
Same As/Similar To
HR588 (Related) 2014-07-08 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Africa
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Democratic Republic of the Congo
Human rights
Immigration
Visas and passports
Africa
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Democratic Republic of the Congo
Human rights
Immigration
Visas and passports