US SR515 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5186)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5186)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution welcoming Prime Minister Lee Hsien-Loong to the United States and reaffirming Singapore's strategic partnership with the United States, encompassing broad and robust economic, military-to-military, law enforcement, and counterterrorism cooperation. Welcomes Prime Minister Lee Hsien-Loong of Singapore for his official visit to the United States and for the State Dinner on August 2, 2016, as the United States and Singapore commemorate the 50th anniversary of their bilateral diplomatic relationship. Affirms the importance of the U.S.-Singapore strategic partnership in securing regional peace and stability. Applauds Singapore's leadership in counterterrorism, including the deployment of military assets as part of the anti-ISIL (Islamic State of Iraq and the Levant) coalition and innovative counterterrorism efforts within the Asia-Pacific region. Anticipates the deepening of the security relationship following the signing of an enhanced Defense Cooperation Agreement on December 7, 2015, and welcomes further cooperation in areas such as cybersecurity, humanitarian assistance and disaster relief, and defense technology. Recognizes the vitality of the bilateral trade and investment relationship between the United States and Singapore. Expresses support for continued close cooperation between the United States and Singapore to build capacity for commercial engagement, energy development, innovation, trade facilitation, and to achieve development goals in the Asia-Pacific region. Urges the President to continue U.S. support of multilateral institutions and fora, working in close cooperation with partners, such as Singapore, who share a commitment to an inclusive, rules-based regional architecture.
Title
A resolution welcoming Prime Minister Lee Hsien-Loong to the United States and reaffirming Singapore's strategic partnership with the United States, encompassing broad and robust economic, military-to-military, law enforcement, and counterterrorism cooperation.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5186) |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 565. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4729-4730) |
Subjects
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Singapore
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Singapore
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status