US SR515 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1236; text: CR S1230-1231)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1236; text: CR S1230-1231)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates February 2020 as Career and Technical Education Month to celebrate career and technical education across the United States.
Title
A resolution supporting the goals and ideals of Career and Technical Education Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1236; text: CR S1230-1231) |
Same As/Similar To
SR79 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1496; text: CR S1493)
HR119 (Related) 2019-02-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR864 (Related) 2020-02-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR119 (Related) 2019-02-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR864 (Related) 2020-02-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Labor and employment
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Vocational and technical education
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Labor and employment
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/515/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres515/BILLS-116sres515ats.pdf |