US SR523 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2922; text: 02/27/2020 CR S1234)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2922; text: 02/27/2020 CR S1234)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution congratulates the people of Greece as they celebrate the 199th anniversary of their country's independence. The resolution recognizes Greece's commitment to democratic principles and the important role that Greece has played both regionally and internationally.
Title
A resolution recognizing the 199th anniversary of the independence of Greece and celebrating democracy in Greece and the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2922; text: 02/27/2020 CR S1234) |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 470. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SR95 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2397; text: 3/5/2019 CR S1662)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Europe
Greece
International affairs
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Congressional tributes
Europe
Greece
International affairs
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status