US SR528 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1479)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution recognizing the importance of the blueberry industry to the United States and designating July 2020 as "National Blueberry Month". This resolution (1) designates July 2020 as National Blueberry Month; and (2) recognizes the contributions of blueberry growers in the United States and their families, and that purchasing blueberries grown in the United States supports farmers, jobs, and the economy of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution recognizing the importance of the blueberry industry to the United States and designating July 2020 as "National Blueberry Month".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenateReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1479)

Same As/Similar To

HR882 (Related) 2020-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
SR656 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4650; text: 07/22/2020 CR S4428-4429)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback