US SR533 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3019-3022; text: CR S3021-3022)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3019-3022; text: CR S3021-3022)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for International Women's Day and recognition that women's empowerment is inextricably linked to generating economic growth and self-reliance, sustainable peace and democracy, and inclusive security. The resolution also reaffirms the Senate's commitment to end discrimination and violence against women and to pursue policies that guarantee fundamental human rights for women worldwide.
Title
A resolution supporting the goals of International Women's Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3019-3022; text: CR S3021-3022) |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 472. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S1601-1602) |
Same As/Similar To
SR101 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1746-1747; text: S1744-1745)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Crimes against women
Economic development
Human rights
International affairs
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Violent crime
Women's employment
Women's rights
Crimes against women
Economic development
Human rights
International affairs
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Violent crime
Women's employment
Women's rights