US SR538 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S1674)
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S1674)
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution authorizes the use of the atrium in the Philip A. Hart Senate Office Building on April 22, 2020, for the National Prescription Drug Take Back Day, a semiannual event of the Drug Enforcement Administration.
Title
A resolution authorizing the use of the atrium in the Philip A. Hart Senate Office Building for the National Prescription Drug Take Back Day, a semiannual event for the Drug Enforcement Administration.
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S1674) |
Same As/Similar To
SR158 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2392; text: CR S2391)
SR359 (Related) 2019-10-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5853; text: CR S5851)
SR359 (Related) 2019-10-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5853; text: CR S5851)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congress
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Prescription drugs
Senate
Congress
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Prescription drugs
Senate
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/538/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres538/BILLS-116sres538is.pdf |